Financial history THE BRITISH ACOUSTIC NEUROMA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1024443
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £46.48k £50.29k £52.11k £84.76k £54.24k
Total expenditure £50.26k £54.86k £57.11k £70.13k £70.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0