DISCS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make grants for medical research into spinal conditions and the extraction, collation and dissemination, for the benefit of the public , of information from data arising from such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 August 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor CHRISTINE LYN CHORLTON BSc PhD | Chair | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Kevin O'Dowd | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEPHEN PARTINGTON | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BARHAM CARTER BSC FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF ROBERT CHARLES SCHROTER PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £750 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £872 | £372 | £372 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 26TH JULY 1993.
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SPINAL CONDITIONS 2.THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS 3.TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO SPINAL CONDITIONS AND THE EXTRACTION COLLATION AND DISSEMINATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF INFORMATION FROM DATA ARISING WHICH IS REASONABLY EXPECTED TO FACILITATE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CONDITIONS WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM BUT IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH AS AFORESAID AT OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE SPINAL DISORDERS UNIT AT THE CROMWELL HOSPITAL AND THE ROYAL POSTGRADUATE MEDICAL SCHOOL OF HAMMERSMITH HOSPITAL 4.TO MAKE GRANTS FOR MEDICAL RESEARCH AND THE EXTRACTION COLLATION AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION FROM DATA ARISING FROM SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Foxlea
GLOSSOP
Derbyshire
SK13 6XF
- Phone:
- 07857 267842
- Email:
- info@discsfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window