Financial history ELDENE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1024522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £240.58k £262.16k £273.88k £286.93k £306.13k
Total expenditure £245.23k £273.67k £279.02k £278.40k £322.72k
Income from government contracts £195.19k £207.46k £180.16k £207.69k £235.20k
Income from government grants N/A £18.93k £2.73k N/A N/A