Financial history Answers In Genesis UK/Europe

Charity number: 1024543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £315.57k £255.30k £299.30k £237.65k £329.11k
Total expenditure £295.94k £247.86k £262.05k £265.83k £268.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A