THE BUBBLE FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bubble Foundation UK supports the work of the Childrens Bone Marrow Transplant unit at The Great North Childrens Hospital in Newcastle upon Tyne.We treat children from the northern half of England, Scotland ,Northern Ireland and Eire who are born with severe Immunodeficiences. We provide medical & educational equipment,finance research, and support families during a prolonged stay in hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 04 August 1993: Standard registration
- BUBBLE APPEAL (Previous name)
- THE BUBBLE APPEAL (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Andrew James Cant | Chair |
|
||||||
Vicky Philipson | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Turnbull | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bevis Jones | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mylott | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Slatter | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hodgson | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Matthew Clark | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Neil Stotesbury | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR ANDY GENNERY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.92k | £284.78k | £40.57k | £41.54k | £80.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.15k | £87.20k | £78.26k | £78.71k | £156.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPP DEED DATED 1ST DECEMBER 2003 as amended on 02 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM IMMUNOLOGICAL OR INFECTIOUS DISEASES. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO IMMUNOLOGICAL AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES IN CHILDREN AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARD 3
THE GREAT NORTH CHILDRENS HOSPITAL
ROYAL VICTORIA INFIRMARY
OUEEN VICTORIA RD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 4LP
- Phone:
- 07760393187
- Email:
- Bubble.Foundation@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window