HUGGLESCOTE PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1024616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDES PRE-SCHOOL SERVICES FOR CHILDREN AGED 2YRS TO 5 YEARS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £169,246
Total expenditure: £142,396

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDA SPENCER Chair
RETRO COMPUTER MUSEUM
Received: On time
Jessica Taylor Trustee 27 May 2024
None on record
Tabatha Robinson Trustee 27 May 2024
None on record
Alex Preston Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Natasha Springthorpe Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Hayley Danielle Evans Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £90.70k £127.53k £113.27k £141.52k £169.25k
Total expenditure £102.72k £114.00k £117.48k £122.87k £142.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.20k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 09 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST JOHN'S
COMMUNITY CENTRE
GRANGE ROAD
HUGGLESCOTE
COALVILLE LEICESTERSHIRE
LE67 2BQ
Phone:
07385176003
Website:

No information available