Financial history ULVERSTON AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1024630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.70k £5.90k £39.62k £24.13k £26.76k
Total expenditure £5.78k £3.23k £31.24k £32.92k £26.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A