Financial history WEAVERS TRIANGLE TRUST

Charity number: 1024635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.98k £12.80k £17.36k £1.54k £5.89k
Total expenditure £3.45k £6.85k £6.48k £4.65k £5.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £16.34k N/A N/A