FRIENDS OF STRATHMORE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Strathmore School (FOSS) works to help the special needs pupils, many severely disabled, at The Strathmore School in Petersham. FOSS raises funds to help fund education ressources , hold social events and assists the staff to enrich the children's quality education and leisure. FOSS also has the role of a Parent/Teacher Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 August 1993: Standard registration
- F O S S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Curzon | Chair | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dean | Trustee | 06 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IVAN PRYCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.98k | £23.59k | £10.48k | £10.28k | £4.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.14k | £11.26k | £7.84k | £14.83k | £6.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 June 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2021 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD APRIL 1974 AS AMENDED 10TH NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stathmore School
St. Richard Reynolds Catholic Colle
Station Road
TWICKENHAM
TW1 4DQ
- Phone:
- 0208 948 0047
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window