Accounts and annual returns ANOINTED CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1024667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 March 2024 28 February 2025 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 03 March 2023 21 July 2024 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 03 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 March 2021 27 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 March 2020 Not Required