ADRENOLEUKODYSTROPHY FAMILY SUPPORT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HELPING TO SUPPORT ALD SUFFERERS AND THEIR FAMILIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 August 1993: Standard registration
- 21 April 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ALD FAMILY SUPPORT TRUST (Working name)
- ALDFST (Working name)
- ATTIA RESEARCH TRUST INTO ALD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.30k | £26.29k | £15.17k | £7.30k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.13k | £31.14k | £22.46k | £6.24k | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 21 October 2010 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 08 July 2009 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 04 September 2008 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 11 June 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 28 JUNE 1993 AND AMENDED BY DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH JUNE 1998.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ADRENOLEUKO DYSTROPHY;( 2 THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A CENTRE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ADRENOLEUKO DYSTROPHY AND ALLIED CONDITIONS BY MEANS OF CLINICAL ASSESSMENTS AND THERAPIES AND TO ASSESS ITS EFFECTS ON THOSE WHO CONTRACT IT AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND FOR CLINICAL AND HOSPITAL USE; (3. TO RELIEVE THE HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO BY VIRTUE OF THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR THE CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ADRENLEUKO DYSTROPHY AND WHO NEED CONTINUOS CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WHERE APPROPRIATE TO SUFERERS OR CARERS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE BY VIRTUE OF THEIR FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window