CARMARTHEN AND DISTRICT YOUTH OPERA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise theatrical shows to give experience and education to young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 06 August 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL GETHIN ROGERS Chairman | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hazel Jean Thorogood | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Patricia Lewis | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
WYN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN MARGARET HUGHES Secretary | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA MARY ROWLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.07k | £6.85k | £71.45k | £94.30k | £66.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.21k | £5.55k | £46.46k | £90.63k | £62.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.58k | N/A | £3.70k | £3.56k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE,MAINTAIN,IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE EDCUATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND THE ARTS GENERALLY AND TO THE PRESENTATION OF PERFORMANCES WITH AN EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE PURPOSE,THE PRODUCTION AND PROMOTION OF OTHER ARTISTIC EVENTS AND THE PURSUIT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY WHICH CAN USEFULLY BE UNDERTAKEN IN SUPPORT OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREMLE
IDOLE
CARMARTHEN
SA32 8DG
- Phone:
- 07880504093
- Email:
- mikejanrogers@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window