BOROUGHBRIDGE AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB
Charity number: 1024752
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly club meetings and activities both educational and social
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2018
Total income: £31,848
Total expenditure: £25,484
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- North Yorkshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 August 1993: Standard registration
- 09 August 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 September 2017: Re-registered
- 09 August 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/02/2014 | 14/02/2015 | 14/02/2016 | 14/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.41k | £23.58k | £21.97k | £33.44k | £31.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.96k | £20.31k | £14.70k | £35.74k | £25.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | 24 September 2019 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | 24 September 2019 | 270 days late | |
Annual return | 14 February 2017 | 01 May 2018 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2016 | 07 September 2017 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN AGRICULTURE, HOMECRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS,
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BOROUGHBRIDGE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window