Financial history ELHAM VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1024757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £46.44k £86.74k £52.94k £54.82k £56.62k
Total expenditure £43.22k £68.73k £46.70k £45.07k £55.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £54.59k £2.67k £200 £1.45k