BRITISH SMALL ANIMAL VETERINARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1024811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The BSAVA is a professional body for veterinary surgeons and nurses who treat companion animals. It drives/promotes excellence in small animal veterinary practice through focusing on education, science and the community to develop the knowledge and skills of its members. PetSavers, its research arm, funds veterinary clinical studies/research to develop and inform evidence-based veterinary medicine

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 September 1993: Standard registration
  • 31 October 2018: Funds received from 1070581 THE WELFARE FUND FOR COMPANION ANIMALS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PETSAVERS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Little Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Dr Adam George Gow Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Dr David Robert Franklin Godfrey Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Dr James Hughes Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Dr Julian Hoad Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Dr Peter Andrew Graham Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Stephen Brian Spill Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Amanda Walton Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Charles Gorman BVSc MRCVS Trustee 12 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.06m £3.68m £5.26m £5.59m £5.62m
Total expenditure £6.25m £4.80m £4.33m £6.05m £6.48m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £173.20k £30.55k £29.91k £119.61k £52.23k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.61m £3.42m £5.01m £5.24m £5.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £282.95k £222.51k £215.44k £237.80k £226.22k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £150.70k £25.23k £19.99k £98.58k £28.63k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.18m £4.74m £4.28m £6.00m £6.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £64.11k £61.45k £46.58k £48.16k £48.45k
Expenditure - Governance £221.39k £128.95k £132.47k £196.40k £150.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £99.61k £211.11k £146.52k £242.17k £160.92k
Expenditure - Investment management £40.45k £40.03k £46.58k £48.16k £48.45k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £2.52m £2.26m £2.10m £1.99m £1.91m
Long-term investments £10.13m £10.43m £11.63m £10.81m £11.87m
Other assets £3.40m £1.62m £3.49m £1.88m £2.64m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.90m £2.40m £2.83m £1.80m £3.27m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 November 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 November 2022 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WOODROW HOUSE
1 TELFORD WAY
WATERWELLS BUSINESS PARK
QUEDGELEY
GLOUCESTER
GL2 2AB
Phone:
01452726700