Financial history THE GEORGE DAVIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1024818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £69.00k £2.18m £50.79k £567.01k £489.25k
Total expenditure £149.84k £462.77k £158.51k £1.43m £1.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £2.14m N/A £500.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £38.88k N/A £67.01k N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £462.77k N/A £1.43m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £45.63k N/A £10.99k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £417.15k N/A £1.42m N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A