Financial history FRIENDS OF BISHOP CANNINGS SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1024831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.42k £16.73k £13.91k £20.57k £11.82k
Total expenditure £2.26k £11.78k £7.52k £14.78k £9.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A