Financial history PLANET 21

Charity Number: 1024846
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £31.23k £6.18k £3.36k £1.70k £1.38k
Total expenditure £22.86k £11.78k £11.61k £4.20k £5.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A