Accounts and annual returns BISHOPTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1024853
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 01 July 2015 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 01 July 2015 1 days late
Annual return 31 August 2013 30 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 30 June 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2012 11 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 11 June 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2011 12 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 12 June 2012 On Time