KINGS WORLD TRUST FOR CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objective of the Charity is to promote the care,education and upbringing of children and young people in need and to relieve poverty and sickness amongst such children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 August 1993: Standard registration
- SKILLS FOR KIDS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN WAGSTAFF | Chair | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Wagstaff | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Hotchkiss | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Belsie Wagstaff | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nick Wagstaff | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.93k | £76.45k | £220.16k | £77.35k | £77.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.74k | £74.18k | £220.22k | £80.28k | £80.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 March 2025 | 340 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 06 March 2025 | 340 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27TH MARCH 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, EDUCATION AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Stonehill Cottage
Wilsons Road
Headley Down
BORDON
GU35 8JE
- Phone:
- 01428712365
- Email:
- kwtc@haslemere.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window