Accounts and annual returns STEPPING STONES PRE SCHOOL (READING)

Charity Number: 1024885
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 April 2025 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 April 2025 88 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 04 April 2025 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 04 April 2025 308 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 02 April 2025 672 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 07 March 2025 1011 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 03 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window