Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF DENVER VILLAGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1024887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 08 January 2025 222 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 03 July 2023 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 12 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required