Accounts and annual returns FROME VALLEY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1024888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required