MEDICARE FRANCAIS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides medical services to the Francophone community in London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 16 August 1993: Standard registration
- 12 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/09/2012 | 29/09/2013 | 29/09/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.66m | £2.46m | £747.51k | £960.87k | £61.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.59m | £2.50m | £756.94k | £979.31k | £258.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £200.00k | £100.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.41m | £2.26m | £547.51k | £860.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £245.00k | £195.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.57m | £2.48m | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.17k | £23.26k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 08 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 08 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 16 November 2016 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 16 November 2016 | 16 days late | |
Annual return | 29 September 2014 | 04 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2014 | 04 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 September 2013 | 22 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2013 | 22 July 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF MEDICAL CENTRES AND IN PARTICULAR OF THE FRENCH SPEAKING COMMUNITY SUCH EXPRESSION TO INCLUDE PERSONS OF ANY NATIONALITY WHETHER OR NOT PERMANENTLY RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window