Accounts and annual returns JOHN BARRON EUROPEAN STUDIES FUND

Charity number: 1024941
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 16 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 25 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 25 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 12 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 06 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required