Financial history SOUTH PETHERWIN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1024955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £72.36k £68.61k £47.10k £50.33k £728
Total expenditure £68.79k £63.94k £59.15k £56.73k £24.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £39.55k £36.82k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A