ORCHARD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school for children aged 2 years 9 months - 4 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £96,001 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 August 1993: Standard registration
- ORCHARD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren Ratcliffe | Chair | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Broomfield | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Waters | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Lane | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ward-Neale | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Wilde | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Harris | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kaintoch | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carla Venton | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.57k | £94.32k | £103.76k | £110.80k | £117.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.48k | £99.68k | £101.58k | £104.30k | £112.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £85.57k | £76.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £78.13k | £91.60k | £96.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JANUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 10 SEPTEMBER 1996 CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/01/1992 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ANDREWS CHURCH
BEAULIEU ROAD
DIBDEN PURLIEU
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 4PT
- Phone:
- 07906150043
- Website:
-
orchardpreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window