Trustees PORT TALBOT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1025006

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Baker | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Martin | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lockyear | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Murray | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janis Milne | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Angela Bowen | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan McPhee | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Richardson | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA FRANCES JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH MARY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.