Financial history BISHOP WILTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1025008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 03/03/2022 03/03/2023 03/03/2024
Total gross income £2.11k £1.38k £484 £833 £1.21k
Total expenditure £1.60k £1.65k £1.23k £1.21k £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A