Accounts and annual returns FLINT AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1025032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window