Financial history FLINT AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1025032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £27.06k £27.16k £2.49k £76.61k £5.26k
Total expenditure £15.45k £6.22k £10.71k £39.47k £31.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A