Trustees BURPHAM EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1025132

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Rosine Beattie | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Wickwar | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann West | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Goodall | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glenda June Mogg | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Hyland | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Brownjohn | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER HARKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.