TUPSLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1025181
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 09 February 2008

Total income: £2,017
Total expenditure: £2,182

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 1993: Standard registration
  • 09 December 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • TUPSLEY WI IN HEREFORD FEDERATION OF WI'S (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/02/2004 09/02/2006 09/02/2007 09/02/2008
Total gross income £1.02k £1.14k £908 £2.02k
Total expenditure £1.55k £1.14k £820 £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2008 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2007 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2006 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2006 Not Required
Annual return 09 February 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 09 February 2004 08 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 February 2004 Not Required