Accounts and annual returns OLDBURY JAMIA MOSQUE

Charity number: 1025209
Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 September 2023 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 September 2023 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 September 2022 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 November 2022 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 February 2022 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 February 2022 232 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 February 2021 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 February 2021 224 days late Download Open in new window