THE TRIDENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 August 1993: Standard registration
- 07 October 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TRIDENT TRANSNATIONAL TRIDENT (Working name)
- TRIDENT TRANSNATIONAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.99m | £4.41m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.88m | £4.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 29 September 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 03 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 03 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN EUROPE AND THE REST OF THE WORLD WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO PERSONS AGED BETWEEN 14 AND 25 BY: A) THE PROMOTION (WHETHER OR NOT AS PART OF A FORMAL EDUCATION IN ANY TEACHING INSTITUTION) OF CHARACTER TRAINING AMONG SUCH PERSONS AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY AFFORDING OPPORTUNITIES TO SUCH PERSONS: I) TO DEVELOP THEIR PERSONALITIES BY PERSONAL ACHIEVEMENTS OF PRACTICAL UTILITY TO THE COMMUNITY; II) TO ASSIST IN SCHEMES FOR SERVICE TO THE COMMUNITY III) TO OBTAIN PRACTICAL TRAINING EXPERIENCE UNDER CONDITIONS OF EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
EUROPE AND THE REST OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window