SWALLOWFIELD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1025250
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pre-school for children aged 2 1/2 years to 5 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023

Total income: £64,968
Total expenditure: £80,169

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 1993: Standard registration
  • 30 May 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 30 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1026028 BARKHAM PRE SCHOOL
  • 30 May 2024: Funds transferred to 287072 MORTIMER PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SWALLOWFIELD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £58.87k £74.01k £71.18k £77.98k £64.97k
Total expenditure £58.83k £62.41k £68.58k £75.42k £80.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.45k £49.00k £54.82k £56.58k £37.63k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2023 08 February 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 08 February 2024 3 days late
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On Time