Accounts and annual returns WEST TOTTON SQUIRRELS PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1025265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 25 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 February 2025 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 February 2025 239 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2024 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2024 366 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 January 2023 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 January 2023 200 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window