KENILWORTH SCHOOL AND SPORTS COLLEGE PARENTS’ AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PTA OF KENILWORTH SCHOOL HOLD RAFFLES, CAR BOOT SALES AND QUIZ/ MUSIC EVENINGS TO RAISE MONEY FOR ACTIVITIES THE CHILDREN AT THE SCHOOL ARE INVOLVED IN AND TO HELP SUPPLY EQUIPMENT NOT FUNDED BY THE SCHOOL BUDGET
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 August 1993: Standard registration
- KENILWORTH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER'S ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- KENILWORTH SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saziye Ryan | Chair | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Bourton | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Fiona Willson | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Javier Morelli | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.77k | £5.01k | £7.52k | £7.58k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.90k | £0 | £1.34k | £949 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/09/1990 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/1995 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 019266859421
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window