THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION LANCASHIRE NORTH WEST

Charity Number: 1025310
Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pursuing the objectives of the Guide Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022

Total income: £77,581
Total expenditure: £63,410

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 August 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GIRLGUIDING LANCASHIRE NORTH WEST (Working name)
  • LANCASHIRE NORTH WEST GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Fiona Clarkson Chair 17 November 2023
None on record
Rebecca Hubbard Trustee 28 September 2024
None on record
Lorraine Haworth Trustee 28 September 2024
None on record
Dr Deborah Jane Clift Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Hannah Lawrenson Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Sarah Fay Hutton Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
JACQUELINE CLAIRE GIBSON Trustee 17 November 2023
4TH BROUGHTON GUIDE COMPANY
Received: On time
1ST BROUGHTON GUIDE COMPANY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days
Erica Ruth Hutton Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Susan Fiona Sanderson Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Anne Wood Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Natalie Ann Rigby Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Gillian Louise Cookson Trustee 20 December 2021
None on record
Joyce Stanforth Trustee 20 December 2021
GIRLGUIDING MORECAMBE DIVISION
Received: On time
BARBARA WRIGHT Trustee 01 July 2020
SRPCC CAT WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
GUIDE ASSOCIATION PRESTON SOUTH WEST DIVISION
Received: On time
Elaine McGoughan Trustee 19 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £102.80k £61.60k £30.64k £34.74k £77.58k
Total expenditure £64.83k £68.09k £30.16k £17.68k £63.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 31 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 31 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 07 November 2022 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 07 November 2022 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 23 December 2021 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 23 December 2021 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 17 September 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 17 September 2020 17 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Dunnerholme Avenue
Buckshaw Village
CHORLEY
PR7 7HJ
Phone:
07968470464
Email:
No information available