BEESTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing assistance to persons in financial hardship within the urban district of Beeston
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 25 August 1993: Standard registration
- 04 January 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 January 2017: Funds transferred to 1164090 BEESTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/01/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £415 | £419 | £472 | £742 | £140.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345 | £185 | £215 | £2.58k | £144.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 26 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | 30 August 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 19 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 07 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE URBAN DISTRICT OF BEESTON AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 16 JUNE 1911 WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF BEESTON AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 16 JUNE 1911
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window