Financial history PHOENIX CAT RESCUE

Charity Number: 1025353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.13k £9.06k £2.77k £2.50k £2.25k
Total expenditure £2.69k £1.43k £821 £703 £917
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A