SUFFOLK EAST FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purposes of the WI organisation are to enable women to improve and develop conditions of rural life, to advance their education in citizenship, in public question, in music, drama and other cultural subjects and in all branches of agriculture, handicrafts, home economics, health and social welfare. Working together to put into practice these ideals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 August 1993: Standard registration
- SEFWI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Mary Hurley | Chair | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann Last | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Peacher | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diana Rosemary Totten | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wightman | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Robertson | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ELIZABETH PEARSON | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Anita Scruby | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Leesmith | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
WENDY JUNE HEATH | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS V HARTILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.08k | £140.91k | £119.00k | £174.88k | £107.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345.58k | £148.49k | £122.08k | £193.78k | £121.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN AND GIRLS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL AREAS INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) (I) LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL ISSUES OF POLITICAL AND SOCIAL IMPORTANCE; (II) MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS; AND (III) ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, CRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, SCIENCE, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE (B) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (I) EDUCATING PEOPLE IN THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT US OF NATURAL RESOURCES; AND (II) PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION (C) TO ADVANCE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND (D) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND VOLUNTEERING.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE EAST SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 ORFORD STREET
IPSWICH
IP1 3NS
- Phone:
- 01473251632
- Email:
- office@sefwi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window