SOMERSHAM VICTORY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITIES MAIN AIM IS TO PROVIDE THE BEST FACILITIES POSSIBLE FOR EDUCATIONAL, SPORTING & RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN THE VILLAGE. ADDITIONALLY SUPPORTING GROUPS DEALING WITH THE ELDERLY & YOUNG PEOPLE WELCOMING INTEREST FROM ALL OTHER LOCAL GROUPS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £225 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 August 1993: Standard registration
- SOMERSHAM VICTORY HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Joyce Minter | Chair |
|
||||||
Brenda Jane Woods | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Sutton | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Lisanne Elaine Buckridge | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Bell Hulme | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Braithwaite | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Spaxman | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Howlett | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Edward Philip Howlett | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ann Slevin | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.89k | £26.09k | £31.65k | £26.93k | £48.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.53k | £21.82k | £19.48k | £30.38k | £45.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.06k | £20.27k | £5.07k | £225 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH OCTOBER 1985.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SOMERSHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING THE USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SOMERSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Station Approach
Somersham
HUNTINGDON
PE28 3JD
- Phone:
- 07753195913
- Email:
- treasurersvh2018@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window