Financial history Bader College

Charity number: 1025387
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £10.77m £1.85m £5.39m £10.41m £7.53m
Total expenditure £5.60m £3.96m £5.60m £7.46m £6.97m
Income from government contracts N/A £5.48k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.26k £5.48k £5.48k £64.66k £36.01k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.56m £745.28k £1.46m £70.66k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £755.03k £641.69k
Income - Charitable activities £3.93m £713.86k £3.80m £9.05m £6.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £126.08k £99.29k £96.38k £102.74k £113.54k
Income - Other £121.17k £290.00k £26.90k £434.77k £455.90k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.08m £3.73m £5.17m £6.94m £6.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £520.95k £236.49k £425.38k £521.43k £480.67k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £19.95k £23.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0