Bader College

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides academic programmes for undergraduate students whose interests are oriented towards the United Kingdom and Europe; a venue and focal point for international conferences and meetings; and an enhanced educational, social and cultural environment for the local community, through its stewardship of the unique heritage of Herstmonceux Castle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£7,528,854
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £6.32m | |
Other trading activities | £641.69k | |
Investments | £113.54k | |
Other | £455.90k |
Total expenditure:
£6,972,551
Raising funds | £480.67k | |
Charitable activities | £6.49m | |
Other | £0 |
£668,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £36,005 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £480.67k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.49m | |
Retained for future use | £556.30k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £480.67k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.49m | |
Retained for future use | £1.22m |
People

83 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
- Canada
Governance
- 24 August 1993: Standard registration
- BADER INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTRE (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nicholas Mosey | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandra den Otter | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Scott Girvin | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patrick Deane | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Hastings Lewis Knowles | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Casey Dennis Purvis | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.77m | £1.85m | £5.39m | £10.41m | £7.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.60m | £3.96m | £5.60m | £7.46m | £6.97m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.26k | £5.48k | £5.48k | £64.66k | £36.01k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.56m | £745.28k | £1.46m | £70.66k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £755.03k | £641.69k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.93m | £713.86k | £3.80m | £9.05m | £6.32m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £126.08k | £99.29k | £96.38k | £102.74k | £113.54k | |
|
Income - Other | £121.17k | £290.00k | £26.90k | £434.77k | £455.90k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.08m | £3.73m | £5.17m | £6.94m | £6.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £520.95k | £236.49k | £425.38k | £521.43k | £480.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £19.95k | £23.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.12m | £11.03m | £10.88m | £10.87m | £11.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.09m | £2.37m | £2.52m | £2.58m | £3.25m | |
|
Other assets | £2.15m | £799.23k | £1.24m | £2.63m | £2.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £833.09k | £1.51m | £2.09m | £530.78k | £327.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/08/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/03/2011 as amended on 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT DIMINISHING THAT GENERALITY) 1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OF QUEENS UNIVERSITY AT KINGSTON, ONTARIO, CANADA IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE INSOFAR AS THEY ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW 2 TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN AN INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTRE AT THE ESTATE KNOWN AS THE HERSTMONCEUX CASTLE ESTATE, HERSTMONCEUX, EAST SUSSEX OR SUCH OTHER LOCATIONS (WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE) AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE 3 TO PRESERVE FOR USE IN CONNECTION WITH SUCH CENTRE HERSTMONCEUX CASTLE AND SUCH LAND AND BUILDINGS ON THE ESTATE KNOWN AS THE HERSTMONCEUX CASTLE ESTATE AS MAY BE OF SCIENTIFIC OR HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bader College
Herstmonceux Castle
Wartling Road
HAILSHAM
East Sussex
BN27 1RN
- Phone:
- 01323834444
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window