TORBAY MUSEUMS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education by promoting the study of the Natural Sciences and Human History. Particular emphasis is placed on Natural History, Archeology, Anthropology, Ethnography, Social and Local History and the Industrial and Decorative Arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £64,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Torbay
Governance
- 26 August 1993: Standard registration
- TORQUAY MUSEUM SOCIETY (Previous name)
- TORQUAY NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Talbot Powe | Chair | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Flora MacMillan LVO JP | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DOMINIC HULL | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael David Brook | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Stephen J Rippon | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffrey Norman | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £293.73k | £402.30k | £376.36k | £258.68k | £485.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £381.51k | £375.83k | £399.98k | £341.62k | £343.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £37.00k | £301.36k | £207.32k | £37.00k | £64.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/11/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/01/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF THE NATURAL SCIENCES AND HUMAN HISTORY, BY ACQUIRING, HOUSING AND EXHIBITING AND CONSERVING, RESTORING AND REPAIRING OBJECTS AND COLLECTIONS OF AN EDUCATIONAL NATURE WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON NATURAL HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY, ANTHROPOLOGY, ETHNOGRAPHY, SOCIAL AND LOCAL HISTORY, AND THE INDUSTRIAL AND DECORATIVE ARTS, AS DEFINED BY THE MUSEUM'S ACQUISITION AND DISPOSAL POLICIES, WITH FURTHER EMPHASIS BEING GIVEN TO SUBJECTS RELATING TO THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND BY ESTABLISHING, ACQUIRING, MANAGING AND MAINTAINING MUSEUMS, GALLERIES, LIBRARIES AND OTHER PLACES WHERE SUCH PURPOSES MAY BE ACHIEVED AND WHERE EDUCATION AND EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH AND ENQUIRY AND THE EXCHANGE AND DISSEMINATION OF RELEVANT VIEWS AND INFORMATION MAY HAPPEN
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
TORQUAY MUSEUM
529 BABBACOMBE ROAD
TORQUAY
TQ1 1HG
- Phone:
- 01803293975
- Email:
- enquiries@torquaymuseum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window