Financial history LITTLE DOVES WATERHOUSE & DISTRICT PARENT, BABY & TODDLER GROUP

Charity number: 1025419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £762 £123 £118 £364 £478
Total expenditure £895 £90 £342 £502 £601
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A