CUMBRIAN RAILWAYS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage interest and research into the railway history of Cumbria and adjacent areas; To collect and preserve information and materials for the advancement of public education;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
Governance
- 01 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Pickup | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Eliot Andersen | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANDREW HUNTER | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARRY STEPHENSON | Trustee | 17 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WARHURST | Trustee | 19 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ken Harper | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PEASCOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP T TUER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.49k | £24.68k | £28.36k | £33.46k | £25.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.65k | £21.61k | £23.67k | £29.01k | £22.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1976 AS AMENDED 27/03/1993, 22/03/1997, 16/03/2002,19/03/2011 AND AS AMENDED ON 21/03/2015 as amended on 13 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE RAILWAY HISTORY OF CUMBRIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Moor Road
Orrell
Wigan
WN5 8SA
- Phone:
- 01942 217300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window