Financial history Stockport Community Counselling

Charity number: 1025437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.16k £6.44k £8.63k £7.10k £8.38k
Total expenditure £6.86k £4.46k £4.51k £4.98k £6.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A