VICTIM SUPPORT - BEDFORDSHIRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Victim Support helps victims of crime. We are an independent organisation offering a free and confidential service, irrespective of whether a crime has been reported.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 09 September 1993: Standard registration
- 18 June 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 18 June 2009: Funds transferred to 298028 VICTIM SUPPORT
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 28/02/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £538.73k | £511.44k | £502.55k | £527.52k | £484.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £497.98k | £490.33k | £548.47k | £510.61k | £479.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £71.69k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £452.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.63k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £422.34k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2008 | 05 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2008 | 05 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 May 2008 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 03 June 2008 | 124 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 24 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 16 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 02 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 02 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JULY 1993
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS WITHIN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE SAME AS A RESULT OF ANY CRIMINAL OFFENCE COMMITTED BY ANY PERSON OR THROUGH ANY MEANS WHATEVER AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS BY RESEARCH INTO ISSUES RELATING TO THE VICTIMS OF CRIME AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window